WA HB1251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning security breaches of election systems or election data including by foreign entities.
Title
Concerning security breaches of election systems or election data including by foreign entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 101, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |