WA HB1355 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning noxious weeds.
Title
Concerning noxious weeds.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 217, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2021-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-09 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 04 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 10 | 890 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 44 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |