WA HB1377 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving students' mental health by enhancing nonacademic professional services.
Title
Improving students' mental health by enhancing nonacademic professional services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 200, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | APP - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Education. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | ED - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education |