WA HB1382 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing for redistribution of medications under certain conditions.
Title
Allowing for redistribution of medications under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |