WA HB1390 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a benefit increase to certain retirees of the public employees' retirement system plan 1 and the teachers' retirement system plan 1.
Title
Providing a benefit increase to certain retirees of the public employees' retirement system plan 1 and the teachers' retirement system plan 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 329, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to concur. |
2020-03-07 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5400 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.