WA HB1419 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the prohibition on planning for a nuclear attack in emergency management plans.
Title
Removing the prohibition on planning for a nuclear attack in emergency management plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-30 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1419&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1419.pdf |