WA HB1458 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unemployment insurance benefits for apprenticeship program participants.
Title
Concerning unemployment insurance benefits for apprenticeship program participants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-06 | House | Chapter 30, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-03-31 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2023-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-10 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |