WA HB1544 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the effective date of certain actions taken under the growth management act.
Title
Addressing the effective date of certain actions taken under the growth management act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |