WA HB1576 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating greater efficiency in the offices of county assessors by allowing notification via electronic means.
Title
Creating greater efficiency in the offices of county assessors by allowing notification via electronic means.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-03 | House | Chapter 131, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5443 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.