WA HB1605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring traumatic brain injury screenings for children entering the foster care system.
Title
Requiring traumatic brain injury screenings for children entering the foster care system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-24 | House | Chapter 120, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-15 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |