WA HB1645 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to addressing the educator shortage and diversifying the educator workforce by supporting future educators from local communities.
Title
Relating to addressing the educator shortage and diversifying the educator workforce by supporting future educators from local communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1645&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1645.pdf |