WA HB1659 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying dates related to the application due date for health sciences and services authorities and their sales and use tax authority.
Title
Modifying dates related to the application due date for health sciences and services authorities and their sales and use tax authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Corry [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Alex Ybarra [R] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-02-22 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5452 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.