WA HB1691 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning funding and administering local government infrastructure by the public works board.
Title
Concerning funding and administering local government infrastructure by the public works board.
Sponsors
Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |