WA HB1693 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the students experiencing homelessness and foster youth pilot program.
Title
Expanding the students experiencing homelessness and foster youth pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5702 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 50 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 77 | 850 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |