WA HB1738 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing public funding for supreme court campaigns.
Title
Providing public funding for supreme court campaigns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-06 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-02 | SGTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-02 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:45 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |