WA HB1815 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving the school district levy base.
Title
Preserving the school district levy base.
Sponsors
Rep. Edwin Anderson [R] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Marcie Maxwell [D] |
Rep. Kevin Parker [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-05-25 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-05-03 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-05-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-04-29 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-03-23 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-16 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-03-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-25 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-25 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-21 | APPE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education Appropriations & Oversight at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-03 | First reading, referred to Education Appropriations & Oversight. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5652 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.