WA HB1829 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning veterans' assistance levies.
Title
Concerning veterans' assistance levies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM failed. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |