WA HB1838 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the responsibilities for the transportation revenue forecast for the transportation budget to the economic and revenue forecast council.
Title
Transferring the responsibilities for the transportation revenue forecast for the transportation budget to the economic and revenue forecast council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023*. |
2023-05-09 | House | Chapter 390, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2023-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-23 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 12:00 PM. |
2023-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5757 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 88 | 125 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 33 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 33 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 33 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |