WA HB1847 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the sufficiency of signatures for petitions in cities, towns, and code cities.
Title
Addressing the sufficiency of signatures for petitions in cities, towns, and code cities.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1847&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1847.pdf |