WA HB1877 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the release of driving record abstract information affecting registered tow truck operators.
Title
Concerning the release of driving record abstract information affecting registered tow truck operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |