WA HB1881 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a uniform standard for creating an established relationship for the purposes of coverage of audio-only telemedicine services.
Title
Establishing a uniform standard for creating an established relationship for the purposes of coverage of audio-only telemedicine services.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Bryan Sandlin [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2023-12-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5821 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 05 | 700 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 43 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | 325 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1881&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1881.pdf |