WA HB1904 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding high-cost critical programs at institutions of higher education.
Title
Regarding high-cost critical programs at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Edwin Anderson [R] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Rep. Kevin Parker [R] |
Rep. Deb Wallace [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1904&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1904.pdf |