WA HB1912 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the expiration date of the existing business and occupation tax rate for the manufacture and wholesale of certain solar energy systems.
Title
Extending the expiration date of the existing business and occupation tax rate for the manufacture and wholesale of certain solar energy systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5752 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-20 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1912&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1912.pdf |