WA HB1967 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding any person who is convicted of a hit and run resulting in death from being eligible for a first-time offender waiver.
Title
Excluding any person who is convicted of a hit and run resulting in death from being eligible for a first-time offender waiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-30 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |