WA HB2006 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning court interpreters.
Title
Concerning court interpreters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-29 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-12 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-12 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 04 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 42 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
2 | 43 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 43 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 56 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 105 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |