WA HB2009 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating the use of dental records in missing person investigations.
Title
Facilitating the use of dental records in missing person investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-18 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-11 | House | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 50 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 50 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |