WA HB2015 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning incentivizing adult family homes to increase bed capacity to seven or eight beds.
Title
Concerning incentivizing adult family homes to increase bed capacity to seven or eight beds.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-18 | House | Chapter 147, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-18 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2024-01-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-01-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-29 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-12 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 128 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 128 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |