WA HB2017 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/1/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the master license service program to the department of revenue.
Title
Transferring the master license service program to the department of revenue.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Effective date 7/1/2011. | |
2011-05-10 | Chapter 298, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-10 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-14 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-14 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-04-13 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. | |
2011-04-09 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-31 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-03-31 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-30 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-14 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |