WA HB2067 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Screening newborn infants for congenital cytomegalovirus.
Title
Screening newborn infants for congenital cytomegalovirus.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2023-12-29 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5829 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2067&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/2067.pdf |