WA HB2072 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning collected compostable waste.
Title
Concerning collected compostable waste.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-06-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2072&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2072.pdf |