WA HB2175 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing penalties for marihuana or cannabis type substance.
Title
Addressing penalties for marihuana or cannabis type substance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-14 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2175&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2175.pdf |