WA HB2191 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding two voting members that are transit users to the governing body of public transportation benefit areas.
Title
Adding two voting members that are transit users to the governing body of public transportation benefit areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Timmons [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2024-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-25 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2024-01-11 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6185 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.