WA HB2235 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating effective and timely access to magistrates for purposes of reviewing search warrant applications.
Title
Creating effective and timely access to magistrates for purposes of reviewing search warrant applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-18 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-30 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB6279 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.