WA HB2302 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning snack bar licenses.
Title
Concerning snack bar licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-27 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-27 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
SB6148 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.