WA HB2305 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the handling of certain personal property in a self-service storage facility.
Title
Concerning the handling of certain personal property in a self-service storage facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-13 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-01-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:30 AM. |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2015-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6148 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2305&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2305.pdf |