WA HB2343 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/1/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Effective date 7/1/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Achieving savings in education programs.
Title
Achieving savings in education programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Effective date 7/1/2009. | |
2009-05-18 | Chapter 539, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-18 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-25 | President signed. | |
2009-04-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-04-23 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-04-21 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-04-20 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-20 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-20 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-04-18 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-04-18 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-04-13 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |