WA HB2407 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing protections for child welfare workers.
Title
Increasing protections for child welfare workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Travis Couture [R] | Rep. Alicia Rule [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-20 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-30 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 14b | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 14b | 005 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 14b | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |