WA HB2422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-5)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the suspended inflationary increases in educational employee compensation.
Title
Restoring the suspended inflationary increases in educational employee compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-03-01 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-03-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB6235 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-17 - First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2422&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2422.pdf |