WA HB2441 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the social security offset to disability compensation.
Title
Restricting the social security offset to disability compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |