WA HB2479 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Placing restrictions on retired law enforcement officers and firefighters employed in certain public positions.
Title
Placing restrictions on retired law enforcement officers and firefighters employed in certain public positions.
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Rep. Roger Freeman [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB6397 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - Referred to Rules.