WA HB2515 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-13 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the treatment of population enumeration data, including exempting it from public inspection and copying.
Title
Concerning the treatment of population enumeration data, including exempting it from public inspection and copying.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Chapter 14, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | House | GOE - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-31 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SB6006 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.