WA HB2527 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the prevailing rate of wage based on collective bargaining agreements or other methods if collective bargaining agreements are not available.
Title
Establishing the prevailing rate of wage based on collective bargaining agreements or other methods if collective bargaining agreements are not available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-31 | House | LWD - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-31 | House | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development |