WA HB2548 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tribally controlled colleges and universities.
Title
Concerning tribally controlled colleges and universities.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |