WA HB2640 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that facilities that are operated by a private entity in which persons are detained in custody under process of law pending the outcome of legal proceedings are not essential public facilities under the growth management act.
Title
Clarifying that facilities that are operated by a private entity in which persons are detained in custody under process of law pending the outcome of legal proceedings are not essential public facilities under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 3/25/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 128, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 88; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-30 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6504 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.