WA HB2646 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing certification exemptions and training requirements for certain individual provider long-term care workers.
Title
Providing certification exemptions and training requirements for certain individual provider long-term care workers.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Roger Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6421 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-24 - First reading, referred to Health Care.