WA HB2733 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designating certain hydroelectric generation from a generation facility located in irrigation canals and certain pipes as an eligible renewable resource under chapter 19.285 RCW.
Title
Designating certain hydroelectric generation from a generation facility located in irrigation canals and certain pipes as an eligible renewable resource under chapter 19.285 RCW.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-19 | House | Chapter 45, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | TED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |