WA HB2795 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Investing in education by clarifying laws relating to tobacco substitutes.
Title
Investing in education by clarifying laws relating to tobacco substitutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-04 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-03-04 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-03-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |