WA HJM4009 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to incorporate Puerto Rico into the United States.
Title
Requesting Congress to incorporate Puerto Rico into the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=4009&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Joint Memorials/4009-Puerto Rico.pdf |