WA SB5007 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a wine retailer shipper's permit.
Title
Establishing a wine retailer shipper's permit.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] |
Sen. Nikki Torres [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
66 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
66 | 20 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |