WA SB5009 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the department of information services' authority to provide services to public agencies.
Title
Regarding the department of information services' authority to provide services to public agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-02 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Economic Development, Trade & Innovation at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-13 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. | |
2011-12-13 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5009&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5009.pdf |